Financial history Lickhill Primary School Parent, Teacher and Friends of Association

Charity number: 1135084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.21k £2.03k £18.75k £10.92k £15.16k
Total expenditure £5.17k £111 £16.85k £7.99k £7.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A