THE PARENT AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF THE STEINER ACADEMY HEREFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money through various events held at The Steiner Academy Hereford to support the charities aims. These include class fundraisers such as cake stalls, a summer fair, cabaret etc and whole school events such as a summer Garden Festival and Advent Fair. We also support our school community by providing informative talks and practical support where needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 18 May 2010: Standard registration
- FRIENDS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophy Simpson | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Barnes | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thorne | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.45k | £72.31k | £79.23k | £88.66k | £85.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.12k | £68.94k | £73.91k | £81.22k | £85.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 September 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 September 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION ("THE OBJECTS") IS TO SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE SCHOOL COMMUNITY, AND TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF STEINER EDUCATION IN ITS WIDEST SENSE, IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS, OR OTHERWISE SUPPORT THE COMMUNITY OR WIDER EDUCATIONAL AIMS OF THE STEINER MOVEMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEINER ACADEMY
MUCH DEWCHURCH
HEREFORD
HR2 8DL
- Phone:
- 01981540221
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window