FRONTLINE DEBT ADVICE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Debt Counselling Debt Adjusting Benefits Advice Personal Budgetting Advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Surrey
- Warwickshire
- West Berkshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Standard registration
- 15 September 2015: Funds received from 1087299 ANDOVER BRIDGE THAT GAP TRUST
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL ELLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Kevin Neve | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Veronica Nelson | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Graham Kennedy | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Fisher | Trustee | 18 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARNOLD DAVID BISSETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.64k | £51.84k | £60.28k | £54.45k | £49.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.83k | £44.99k | £45.62k | £50.85k | £50.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME THINK FIT, AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, POVERTY OR HARDSHIP AND WHO MAY BE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DEBT COUNSELLING, BENEFITS ADVICE, BUDGETING, EDUCATION AND OTHER RELEVANT SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Three Counties Church
Haslemere Locality Office
Lion Green
HASLEMERE
Surrey
GU27 1LD
- Phone:
- 01428609010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window