Financial history GATEWAY CHURCH (DONCASTER)

Charity number: 1135204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.25k £10.37k £11.68k £10.67k £7.47k
Total expenditure £8.06k £7.20k £7.82k £8.04k £8.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A