A FISH FOR LIFE

Charity number: 1134866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help underprivileged, vulnerable children by providing means of safe shelter and education. In 2010 we completed a project in Kenya where we sent a team of skilled tradesmen over to the Fururah Orphanage to build them a new Girls Dormitory, the Charity funded this entire project and is still funding eduction to some of the children at the Orphanage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 04 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE ROBINSON Trustee
None on record
JOHN ROBINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/01/2022 04/01/2023 04/01/2024
Total gross income £4.83k £1.41k £3.30k £3.68k £0
Total expenditure £3.03k £3.36k £3.59k £3.77k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 January 2024 22 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2020 16 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WILDWOOD
BURGHAM PARK
LONGHORSLEY
MORPETH
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE65 9QY
Phone:
01665600997
Website:

No information available