THE GRADELY AND JOHN PETTIT JUNIOR SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The holding on trust of facilities at the Ross Sports Ground in Grimsby to encourage participation in amateur sports, particularly cricket and football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Standard registration
- Ross Sports Association (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benn Cass | Chair | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Leach | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Cass | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stefanie Burton | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £3.24k | £3.02k | £4.20k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £2.28k | £3.57k | £3.18k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE PARTICIPATION IN AMATEUR SPORT BY YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE GRIMSBY AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR FOOTBALL AND CRICKET.
Area of benefit
GRIMSBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Curry Road
GRIMSBY
DN34 4EZ
- Phone:
- 07754009184
- Email:
- benncass@croftsyfl.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window