RAINBOW ROOMS UK LGBT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to better the lives of LGBT people and the familys and friends of LGBT people through education and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
- 07 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RAINBOW ROOMS UK LGBT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2011 | 30/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | 16 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2011 | 31 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 25 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE EMOTIONAL SUFFERING AND MEET THE NEEDS OF PERSONS (IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PERSONS) WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL OR TRANSGENDER (LGBT) OR UNCERTAIN OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVOCACY AND SUPPORT. 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE LGBT OR UNCERTAIN OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY AND THEIR FAMILIES, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT MATTERS THAT AFFECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. 3) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 IN THE UK, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE LGBT OR UNCERTAIN OF THEIR SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION
Area of benefit
UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window