LITTLE FLYERS (BOSCOMBE DOWN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little flyers is a Nursery for 0-4 year olds operating from 8.45am to 3.15pm during term time. We provide indoors and out door activities in line with the EYFS and have a fully qualified team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 June 2010: Standard registration
- 02 July 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1097940 ACTION FOR CHILDREN
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.65k | £200.05k | £190.83k | £199.19k | £176.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.72k | £188.14k | £192.14k | £181.03k | £215.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 06 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 11 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 11 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 02 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 02 February 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 FEB 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOUSE GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY 2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window