THE BISHOP'S MEADOW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To acquire and thereafter maintain as public open space The Bishop's Meadows in Farnham - a little piece of Farnham that remains forever ours
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,481 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Libby Ralph | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Lightfood | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Weller | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL FRANK | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GREEN | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £23.41k | £16.55k | £28.67k | £10.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.55k | £32.92k | £9.69k | £6.37k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.85k | £3.65k | £3.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED COMPANIES HOUSE 5 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE LAND KNOWN AS BISHOP'S MEADOW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FARNHAM, SURREY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: (A) AS A PUBLIC OPEN SPACE FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE , INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND/OR (B) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Area of benefit
FARNHAM, SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
14th Floor
33 Cavendish Square
W1G 0PW
- Phone:
- 02074479000
- Email:
- Info@bishopsmeadowtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window