Financial history BARTON PRE SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity Number: 1134880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £185.84k £207.69k £175.94k £183.00k £209.70k
Total expenditure £159.63k £177.51k £167.67k £182.00k £221.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A