THE OURSPACE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing together children from varying backgrounds to broaden their outlook, instill self esteem and become ambassadors for community cohesion when returning to their home environment. Schools from different areas are linked and maintain that link after the initial residential. It is planned to extend this work to parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bradford City
- Lancashire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
- 21 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- OURSPACE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.19k | £33.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.59k | £36.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 16 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 26 March 2013 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 22 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 07 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 01 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (FOR EXAMPLE):- (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER,DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT OF EQUALITY IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window