Trustees GRIMSBY SAILORS AND FISHING CHARITY

Charity number: 500816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Duncan KW Watt Chair 22 August 2018
None on record
Joanne Stansfield Trustee 14 July 2023
None on record
Simon Dwyer Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Superintendent Suesan Brown Trustee 28 August 2019
None on record
James Cane Trustee 14 May 2018
None on record
Mike Walters Trustee 05 January 2017
None on record
David Johnson Trustee 04 January 2017
None on record
Andrew John Allard Trustee
None on record