WOODBRIDGE QUAY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION INCLUDING EDUCATION, COMMUNITY SERVICE AND SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH SHALL DETERMINE. THE CHURCH PROVIDES INSTRUCTION FOR ALL AGE GROUPS IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND HOLDS PUBLIC CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- WQC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Phelan | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Kamfer | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joanne Fowler | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Grant | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debra Scurrell | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Clive Knight | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Guy Chirstian Mansell | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
REV Doug Waller | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.40k | £170.94k | £191.41k | £216.02k | £223.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.21k | £130.81k | £168.81k | £208.00k | £190.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quay Church
Quay Street
WOODBRIDGE
IP12 1BX
- Phone:
- 01394 382360
- Email:
- office@thequay.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window