THE CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education by promoting debating, hosting educational events, training members and public in debating for debating competitions. Encourage the exchange of ideas and provide access by the public to the Charity's facilities and events; provide workshops for local school children to introduce them to debating and enable students and young people from disadvantaged backgrounds to participate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,362,229
Donations and legacies | £20 | |
Charitable activities | £354.52k | |
Other trading activities | £1.84m | |
Investments | £164.81k | |
Other | £4.14k |
Total expenditure:
£2,476,003
Raising funds | £1.51m | |
Charitable activities | £960.59k | |
Other | £4.74k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.52m | |
Charitable expenditure | £960.59k |
People

47 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
132 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 May 2010: Standard registration
- 05 July 2011: Funds received from 282774 CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roberta Simone Rennie | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anoushka Kale | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graham Virgo KC | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Tett OBE | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Elisabeth Kendall | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Angela Hampshire-Broughton | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohamed El Erian | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lord Stephen Graeme Parkinson OBE | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Catherine Nathan OBE | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Philip Sutton Harrison | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NICHOLAS ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Green | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Henry Branch | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Nicholas Heath | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £756.25k | £645.32k | £2.19m | £2.12m | £2.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £898.65k | £994.20k | £2.30m | £2.46m | £2.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.57k | £312 | £3.24k | £10.25k | £20 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £280.20k | £191.36k | £1.63m | £74.05k | £1.84m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £288.77k | £264.73k | £396.36k | £333.09k | £354.52k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £155.10k | £130.20k | £77.92k | £120.14k | £164.81k | |
|
Income - Other | £29.61k | £58.71k | £78.30k | £26.15k | £4.14k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £663.86k | £677.23k | £891.48k | £2.46m | £960.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £234.78k | £264.07k | £6.76k | £5.83k | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.18k | £1.77k | £6.76k | £5.83k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £52.91k | £1.40m | £0 | £4.74k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.45m | £11.17m | £10.80m | £8.96m | £9.43m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.09m | £0 | £0 | £1.76m | £1.05m | |
|
Other assets | £2.55m | £324.55k | £837.96k | £363.55k | £663.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £673.99k | £2.15m | £1.64m | £2.15m | £2.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 THE GENERAL OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (LISTED BELOW) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY MEMBERS AND OF THE PUBLIC MORE GENERALLY. THE CHARITY'S PRIMARY OBJECT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.1 PROMOTING THE SKILL OF DEBATING AND THE CONSIDERATION OF MATTERS OF PUBLIC LIFE OR IMPORTANCE; 3.2.2 HOSTING EDUCATIONAL EVENTS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DEBATES ON TOPICS OF IMPORTANCE AND LECTURES GIVEN BY INDIVIDUAL PERSONS OF DISTINCTION; 3.2.3 PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE PRACTICE OF DEBATING TO CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY MEMBERS AND ALSO BY PROVIDING FOR THE TUITION OF OTHERS IN THE PRACTICE OF DEBATING BY CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY MEMBERS; 3.2.4 PROVIDING FOR THE ENTRANCE OF CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY MEMBERS IN DEBATING COMPETITIONS, INCLUDING COMPETITIONS HELD BY THE CHARITY, AND ALSO BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO COMPETE IN THE PRACTICE OF DEBATING; 3.2.5 ASSISTING CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION WITH THE ORGANISATION AND PROMOTION OF EVENTS AIMED AT WIDENING ACCESS TO CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY AND THE PROMOTION OF HIGHER EDUCATION MORE GENERALLY; 3.2.6 PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENCOURAGE THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS AND PROVISION OF ACCESS BY THE PUBLIC TO THE CHARITY'S FACILITIES AND EVENTS; 3.3.2 PROVIDING WORKSHOPS FOR THE PUPILS OF SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES TO ATTEND TO INTRODUCE THEM TO THE PRACTICE OF DEBATING; AND 3.3.3 ENABLING STUDENTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS TO PARTICIPATE IN ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS AIMED AT INCREASING THEIR CONFIDENCE, SKILLS AND ASPIRATIONS."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMBRIDGE UNION SOCIETY
9A BRIDGE STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1UB
- Phone:
- 01223566421
- Email:
- info@cus.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window