Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY NATIVITY, CHAPEL HOUSE
Charity number: 1134615

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Waldemar Hubert Marie Nion | Chair | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Gabriella Ayre | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Owens | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Guy | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Tinning | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Atkinson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Walker | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Finch | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Martin | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Aririsukwu | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Baron | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Connell | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LATTIMER | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA CHRISTINE PERRY | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.