THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES', NORMANTON BY DERBY

Charity number: 1135070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Anglican Church, preaching the Gospel, proclomation and outreach

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £207,889
Total expenditure: £184,564

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST GILES' PCC NORMANTON BY DERBY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Andrew Roworth Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Olivia Grace Longman Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Thomas Alexander Beamish Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Hannah Lucy Buckingham Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Anna-Louise Lake Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Claire Deeks Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
Rebecca Brookes Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Rev William Alistair Eley Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Tom Daiming Wright Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
JENNIFER KATHLEEN STOCKWELL Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Jill Elizabeth Gratton Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record
ANDREW JEFFREY BEATTIE Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record
DAVID JOHN SHACKLOCK Trustee 22 June 2012
None on record
REVD NEIL ANDREW AUSTIN BARBER Trustee
CHADDESDEN ANGLICAN EVANGELICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST CIO
Recently registered
CAROLE SWINBURN Trustee
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST CIO
Recently registered
LIZ COX Trustee
THE PROCLAMATION TRUST
Received: On time
JAMES DAVID GODWIN Trustee
None on record
PAUL JAMES TRETHEWEY Trustee
None on record
NIGEL ARTHUR SELBY Trustee
None on record
RAY KILGOUR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £176.18k £188.29k £157.76k £142.32k £207.89k
Total expenditure £208.83k £168.40k £154.03k £126.02k £184.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. GILES CHURCH
209 VILLAGE STREET
DERBY
DE23 8DE
Phone:
01332776287