THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY,SPRINGFIELD, DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 1135072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all; The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; Pastoral work; Teaching of Christianity; Taking of religious assemblies in schools; Promotion of Christianity; Provision of activities for senior citizens; Parents and toddlers and other special need groups; Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £99,635
Total expenditure: £95,020

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY SRINGFIELD PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV KEITH ANTHONY RODDY Chair 09 October 2012
None on record
Vicki Jones Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
David Harmsworth Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Andy Parker Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Alexander Evans Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Richard Scott Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Elaine Charlesworth Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Mary Ruth Want Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
John William Dawson Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Eleanor Mary Evans Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
MARTIN JOHN CHARLESWORTH Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
IAN DAVID FULLER Trustee
Chelmsford Garden Community Trust
Received: On time
SPRINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £106.06k £120.26k £105.04k £84.81k £99.64k
Total expenditure £106.27k £152.63k £110.13k £86.79k £95.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holy Trinity Springfield
Trinity Road
CHELMSFORD
CM2 6HS
Phone:
01245 284663