GREEN LIGHT - MUSLIM YOUTH FORUM (DUDLEY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bright Sparks Academy - Islamic Supplementary school aimed at 9-11 year-old from the Dudley area. Tutoring Academy - KS2 to KS4 English, Maths and Science. Reverts Circle - Casual get together support group. Mums and Tots. SisterÔÇÖs Tajweed. SisterÔÇÖs Coffee Morning - Monthly get together, discussions about current affairs and books etc. Jumble sale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 06 July 2010: Standard registration
- 25 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GREEN LIGHT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/01/2013 | 08/01/2014 | 08/01/2015 | 08/01/2016 | 08/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.87k | £9.92k | £6.06k | £4.07k | £3.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.95k | £21.65k | £3.60k | £4.96k | £3.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2017 | 16 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2015 | 25 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 09 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 17 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN DUDLEY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF A ADVANCING LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B ADVANCING EDUCATION C RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS 2 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY A EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENCE RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS B PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS
Area of benefit
DUDLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window