CLACTON AND DISTRICT OCCUPATIONAL WORKSHOPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CADOWS is a day centre for adults with learning difficulties or mental health issues. The Clients at CADOWS have the use of 10 computers with access to the internet. Clients as well as interacting with others are involved in various craft based tasks such as making festive cards, producing stencils and templates. Clients are taken on trips during the year to give them a better quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 06 May 2010: Standard registration
- 07 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 November 2023: Re-registered
- CADOWS (Working name)
- CLACTON AND DISTRICT OCCUPATIONAL WORKSHOP SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shelley Anderton | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Campbell | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
paul staunton | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ann green | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
david bowell | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.54k | £9.70k | £36.26k | £12.74k | £6.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.80k | £3.34k | £3.24k | £5.34k | £15.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/05/2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND EDUCATE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN NORTH ESSEX BY PROVIDING WORKSHOP FACILITIES FOR THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE MAKING OF WOODEN GARDEN FURNITURE, BIRTHDAY CARDS AMONGST OTHER ITEMS IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND HELP THEM BECOME LESS DISADVANTAGED AND GAIN SKILLS TO HELP THEM INTO EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NORTH ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
CADOWS
24 Old Road
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO15 1HX
- Phone:
- 07379836381
- Email:
- cadows24@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window