HOLY TRINITY SOUTH CHATHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The churches of the charity celebrate public worship; teach the Christian faith; engage with the local community through mission, evangelism and social outreach; pastoral care including visiting the sick and bereaved; and the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £654 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 09 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- HTSC (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Alexander Kichenside | Chair | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Brian Daniels | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Young | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Credwyn June Tolhurst | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Horwell | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Mary Lawrence | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Long | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK SALTER | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Donald Vincent Lawrence | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ina Frances Hanford | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Lillian Bassett | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA JEANETTE WRIGGLESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.99k | £101.79k | £102.69k | £140.51k | £159.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.90k | £109.86k | £119.53k | £136.85k | £157.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £654 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches. In achieving its purpose, the Charity will engage in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including (but not restricted to): a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; and f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY SOUTH CHATHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Mayford Road
CHATHAM
Kent
ME5 8SZ
- Phone:
- 01634862265
- Email:
- webrequest@southchatham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window