Financial history AHLULBAYT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £314.81k £436.38k £244.95k £251.64k £195.67k
Total expenditure £303.56k £276.21k £325.32k £287.70k £242.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A