ASHMORE PRINGLE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of a free reading room or similar institution in Winster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 June 1971: Standard registration
- ASHMORE PINGLE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT DONALD GREATOREX | Chair |
|
||||||||||
DONALD MALCOLM SHIMWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2025 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2025 | 745 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 16TH JULY 1900
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF A FREE READING ROOM OR SIMILAR INSTITUTION TO BE CARRIED ON IN THE PARISH FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS. IF AT ANY TIME OR TIMES BE NO SUCH READING ROOM OR SIMILAR INSTITUTION CARRIED ON IN THE SAID PARISH THEN DURING SUCH PERIOD UPON TRUST TO PAY AND APPLY THE SAID ANNUAL INCOME IN SUCH MANNER AND FOR SUCH PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PARISH OR THE POOR THEREOF AS THE COUNCIL MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashton House
West Bank
Winster
MATLOCK
DE4 2DQ
- Phone:
- 01629650954
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window