TEACH LEARN ECUADOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a small school in an underprivileged area in South Quito where we offer free English lessons to the local community. We are working to get the appropriate recognition from the Educational Department in Ecuador to be able to offer our English lessons to schools all over Ecuador through an additional project (Online lessons and resources) that will enable us to reach more places and people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Ecuador
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM RONALD MADDISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Franklin Valerio Mendoza | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA YEPEZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £2.19k | £2.60k | £6.67k | £1.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.66k | £3.06k | £1.99k | £3.97k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ECUADOR BY: 1 PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO RUN AND MAINTAIN A SCHOOL, PROVIDE TEACHERS, RESOURCES, MATERIALS AND TEACHING AIDS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN ENGLISH AND IT. 2 COLLECTING DONATIONS OF EDUCATIONAL BOOKS, SOFTWARE, AUDIO VISUAL TEACHING AIDS OR OTHER EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN THE SCHOOL. 3 RECRUITING VOLUNTEERS TO ASSIST TEACHERS AT THE SCHOOL 4 PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION VOLUNTEERS THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT IN ECUADOR BY: COLLECTING DONATIONS OF CLOTHES AND BOOKS, AND OTHER EQUIPMENT FOR DISTRIBUTION IN LOCAL HOSPITALS AND THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
ECUADOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
180 MOUNT PLEASANT
WEMBLEY
HA0 1SH
- Phone:
- 02089034497
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window