THE LITTLE ARK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age in particular but not exclusively by i) offering appropriate play,education & care facilities and training courses ii) creating a happy, caring & inclusive environment in which children can explore & develop & nurture their self esteem & work alongside parents & prepare them for their transition to school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 15 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA GAIL SPRAGG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Clark | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Harrington | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jean Rae | Trustee | 14 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.77k | £159.65k | £159.86k | £166.61k | £191.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.10k | £134.30k | £159.45k | £159.89k | £168.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 APRIL 2010 AND ACCEPTED BY COMPANIES HOUSE 24 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES AND BY II) CREATING A HAPPY AND CARING AND INCLUSIVE ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH CHILDREN CAN EXPLORE AND DEVELOP AND TO NURTURE THEIR SELF-ESTEEM AND WORK ALONGSIDE PARENTS AND PREPARE THEM FOR THEIR TRANSITION TO SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LITTLE ARK
WESLEY SCHOOL ROAD
SINGLETON
ASHFORD
KENT
TN23 5LW
- Phone:
- 01233614665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window