Financial history ST GILES ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1136251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £50.56k £89.00k £150.00k £108.68k £137.36k
Total expenditure £37.91k £82.00k £157.00k £120.16k £164.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A