FOUNDATION FOR THE PARKS AND RESERVES OF COTE D'IVOIRE (FPRCI-UK)

Charity number: 1137836
Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO: A) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF NATIONAL PARKS AND NATURE RESERVES IN THE REPUBLIC OF COTE D'IVOIRE B) ADVANCE LEARNING AND SCIENCE THORUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ENVIRONMENTALLY SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT OF NATIONAL PARKS AND NATURE RESERVES IN THE REPUBLIC OF COTE D'IVOIRE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Ivory Coast

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Ilka Herbinger Trustee 29 November 2014
None on record
Soungalo Jules Prosper Coulibaly Trustee 02 April 2014
None on record
MARTINE COFFI STUDER Trustee
None on record
Dr FRANCIS LAUGINIE Trustee
None on record
BERNARD N'DOUMI Trustee
None on record
YAO BERNARD KOFFI Trustee
None on record
MR VICTOR JEROME NEMBELESSINI-SILUE Trustee
None on record
RENE BOURGOIN Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR VALENTIN N'DOUBA Trustee
None on record
MARIE ANGELINE KOLY LINGER DJIRA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.55m £1.46m £809.00k £739.86k £808.82k
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.69m £2.33m £3.60m £2.41m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.14m £2.96m £26.53k £0 £294.84k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £11.23m £2.20m £0 £0 £271.26k
Income - Investment £636.13k £699.29k £782.47k £723.59k £513.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £16.27k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.59m £2.24m £3.48m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £88.97k £102.41k £98.82k £114.81k £111.09k
Expenditure - Governance £89.86k £56.66k £144.57k £133.61k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.07m £0 £2.09m £3.35m £2.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £88.97k £102.41k £98.82k £114.81k £111.09k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £66.69k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £29.34m £28.84m £29.77m £36.14m £29.70m
Other assets £1.64m £1.93m £2.59m £789.22k £1.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £118.01k £83.87k £61.90k £75.83k £62.71k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wilkins Kennedy
2nd Floor, Regis House
45 King William Street
LONDON
EC4R 9AN
Phone:
+225 22 41 71 00
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available