Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUNNINGHILL AND SOUTH ASCOT

Charity number: 1135244
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £304.35k £262.28k £234.30k £295.05k £320.95k
Total expenditure £339.69k £302.27k £276.30k £331.23k £315.42k
Income from government contracts N/A £3.30k £3.30k £3.30k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A