THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, DENMEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of Christianity. Regular public Christian worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Running a children's playgroup and a youth group. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS PCC, DENMEAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Emma Joy Racklyeft | Chair | 15 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gaskin | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fritz Simpson | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Suzan Markham | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Venn | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Don Tocher | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Boundy | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hillyard | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hillyard | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ANN GASKIN | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Gilbert | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mitchell | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA CATHERINE PARSONS | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ELIZABETH DEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.60k | £136.38k | £104.04k | £114.81k | £129.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.68k | £139.51k | £147.46k | £167.02k | £161.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Hambledon Road
Denmead
WATERLOOVILLE
PO7 6NN
- Phone:
- 023 9226 8757
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window