LGBT CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 March 2010: Standard registration
- 22 October 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LGBT CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE THE HUMAN RIGHTS ARISING UNDER OR BY VIRTUE OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS ACT 1998 AND THE PROMOTION OF THE CONVENTION RIGHTS AS DEFINED BY S 1 HUMAN RIGHTS ACT INCLUDING THE ELIMINATION OF THE INFRINGEMENT OF THOSE RIGHTS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE REMEDIES FOLLOWING ANY BREACH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATIONS; (B) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH IN HUMAN RIGHTS AND PUBLISHING THIS TO THE PUBLIC; (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN HUMAN RIGHTS WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; (D) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF HUMAN RIGHTS BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTISE, SCHEMES FOR EMPLOYERS, AWARD SCHEMES, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; (F) PROMOTING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW RELATING TO HUMAN RIGHTS BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION AS A RESULT OF THE LACK OF RESOURCES. (2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, USE OF THE MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATIONS; (B) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH IN HUMAN RIGHTS AND PUBLISHING THIS TO THE PUBLIC; (C) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN HUMAN RIGHTS WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS; (D) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF HUMAN RIGHTS BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTISE, SCHEMES FOR EMPLOYERS, AWARD SCHEMES, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY; (F) PROMOTING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW RELATING TO HUMAN RIGHTS BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION AS A RESULT OF THE LACK OF RESOURCES. (3) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window