BARNET AND QUEENSBURY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1139306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES THE GENERAL PUBLIC/MANKIND PROVIDES BUILDINGS/FACILITIES ACTS AS UMBRELLA OR RESOURCE BODY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £241,083
Total expenditure: £225,396

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Brent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Martin Wellings Chair
FINCHLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 50 days late
TRINITY (METHODIST/UNITED REFORMED) CHURCH, GOLDERS GREEN
Received: On time
Wesley Historical Society
Received: On time
THE HEATHFIELD TRUST
Received: 4 days late
THE CHAPELS SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE HISTORIC CHAPELS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr ALEC CORIO Trustee 01 September 2020
WILLIAM JACKSON TRUST
Received: On time
LANCELOT HASLUCK TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EAST BARNET
Received: 144 days late
Charlotte Chanda Silwizya BA MCSI Trustee 01 September 2020
TRINITY (METHODIST/UNITED REFORMED) CHURCH, GOLDERS GREEN
Received: On time
Rev Judith Margaret Chapman Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rev Philip Ingram Chapman Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Robert Thompson Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
eric Asamoa Frimpong Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Pauline Powell Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Jane Ray Trustee 10 September 2016
None on record
Rev David Newton Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev Benjamin Twumasi Trustee 01 September 2015
BARNET MULTI FAITH FORUM
Received: On time
FINCHLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 50 days late
GEORGE MALCOLM GILL Trustee 01 September 2014
TRINITY CHURCH MILL HILL (UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST)
Received: On time
Charles Opoku-Badu Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Victoria Roberts Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
REV SHAUN LESLIE SANDERS Trustee 29 September 2011
None on record
Lyn Forster Trustee 29 September 2011
NEW BARNET COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BARNET BROOKSIDE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ROBERT ALDERMAN Trustee
THE GATEHOUSE THEATRE CLUB
Received: On time
DR RICHARD JOHN BINGLE Trustee
BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CEMETERIES IN SOUTH ASIA
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH MILL HILL (UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST)
Received: On time
Graham Steven Wheeler Trustee
BARNET BROOKSIDE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Anna Batchelor Trustee
THE HEATHFIELD TRUST
Received: 4 days late
GRAHAM CHESTNEY Trustee
THE GATEHOUSE THEATRE CLUB
Received: On time
RAVI RANGREJI BSC Trustee
THE HEATHFIELD TRUST
Received: 4 days late
JOYCE DUNSTAN Trustee
None on record
WENDY ROSEMARY TURL BSC PGCE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £238.43k £249.36k £249.38k £235.23k £241.08k
Total expenditure £238.40k £229.22k £216.38k £229.52k £225.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 Long Lane
Finchley
LONDON
N3 2PS
Phone:
02083461700