THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emmanuel has a responsibility for all the people who live in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Wylde Green. We have a strong children and youth element seen in our choirs and many other activities geared towards the younger members of the Parish and Church. Music is a strong suit for Emmanuel. Our Church Hall offers a range of activities provided by community organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 May 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve James Tomlinson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Monaghan | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Linney | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Ellen Brett | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Gotschel | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jane Cryan | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|||||
VERA JOYCE SMART CERT ED | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|||||
KELVIN ROBIN GARDINER AMIMI | Trustee | 16 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYN NORMAN ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Howard Mason | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.63k | £47.89k | £86.37k | £65.99k | £85.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.24k | £55.43k | £57.54k | £63.56k | £116.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 December 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 KEMPSON AVENUE
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B72 1HJ
- Phone:
- 01213543464
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window