Financial history HOPE'S CHILDREN & YOUNG PEOPLES SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1135680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £286.16k £210.44k £197.85k £239.30k £297.75k
Total expenditure £266.58k £212.06k £242.37k £250.99k £269.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A