HOPE'S CHILDREN & YOUNG PEOPLES SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hope Support Services is a Herefordshire charity set up to support young people & children when a close family member is diagnosed with a life threatening illness. From the moment of diagnosis support is immediate, preventative and continuing. Our vision is to build a foundation of support for young people within their own community. All funds raised within a community are used in that community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2010: Standard registration
- HOPE SUPPORT SERVICES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zinnia Joanne Wilkinson | Chair | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alessandra Grenar | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Meredith | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Bolt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Carl Attwood | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Catherine Glover | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Logan James Ryan | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.16k | £210.44k | £197.85k | £239.30k | £297.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.58k | £212.06k | £242.37k | £250.99k | £269.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/08/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/08/2012 as amended on 11 Nov 2017 as amended on 15 May 2018 as amended on 17 Dec 2020 as amended on 02 Aug 2022 as amended on 28 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
(1) To relieve the mental and physical sickness of persons resident in the United Kingdom, in particular children and young people suffering from bereavement or loss or a serious health crisis of a family member by the provision of workshops and support. (2) To advance the education of professionals working with children and young people suffering from bereavement, loss or the serious illness of a family member by the provision of training.
Area of benefit
HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hope Support Services
Overross House
Ross Park
ROSS-ON-WYE
HR9 7US
- Phone:
- 01989566317
- Email:
- help@hopesupport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window