Financial history COTTINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1137341
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £16.25k £9.57k £11.90k £11.79k £10.53k
Total expenditure £12.08k £9.87k £11.03k £12.14k £9.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A