THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FELIXSTOWE, SAINT JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH SAINT EDMUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular worship open to all The provision of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation Pastoral work, Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups Promotion of Christianity via the staging of events meetings & distribution of literature Promoting the mission of the Church via provision of activities for senior citizens, parents, young people & other special need groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,525 from 3 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 19 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, FELIXSTOWE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Andrew Dotchin | Chair | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Lumley | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Heath | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denis Heath | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bown | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Prewer | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hume | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|||||
GARATH JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV Penny Brinkley | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANNE DONALD PCC Sec | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PENNY BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA EILEEN BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Berry | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.31k | £120.38k | £156.79k | £185.47k | £167.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.06k | £121.90k | £178.03k | £183.41k | £152.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £20.50k | £22.00k | £7.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John the Baptist Church
Orwell Road
Felixstowe
Felixstowe
IP11 7PW
- Phone:
- 07581 390224
- Email:
- admin@felixparish.com
- Website:
-
felixparish.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window