THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', THELWALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church is there for the local community to provide Sunday worship, and baptisms, weddings and funerals. We extend fellowship and support to all members of the community and welcome all to church events. We also reach out to the whole community through our Parish Hall, Parish Magazine and Street Representatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warrington
Governance
- 09 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ALL SAINTS THELWALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ingrid Halliday | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Williams | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SPEED | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Caroline Johnstone | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Monks | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Hague | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Leather | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elisabeth Tipping | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alison London | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William John Alexander | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jon Eric Halliday | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Whittaker | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Jane Young | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
COLIN HORRABIN | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIE FRENCH | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bob Powell | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MIKE HORNE | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PIP HORNE | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATH MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV D J BLACK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.34k | £212.57k | £145.05k | £153.90k | £168.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.81k | £250.28k | £141.66k | £130.23k | £149.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150 | £87.15k | £8.33k | £150 | £150 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS VICARAGE
BELL LANE
THELWALL
WARRINGTON
WA4 2SX
- Phone:
- 01925602475
- Email:
- admin@allsaints.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window