SWANSEA DISABILITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of and assist disabled people living in Swansea to recognize and realise their potential in their own lives, in their communities and in society as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 31 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Roper | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Philips | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Joseph Harrington | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Thomas | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Watkins | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.00k | £247 | £0 | £413 | |
|
Total expenditure | £553 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £246 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 17 December 2023 | 684 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND TO ASSIST PHYSICALLY DISABLED PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH SENSORY IMPAIRMENTS LIVING IN SWANSEA TO RECOGNISE AND REALISE THEIR POTENTIAL IN THEIR OWN LIVES, IN THEIR COMMUNITIES AND IN SOCIETY AS A WHOLE.
Area of benefit
SWANSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 25
Henllys
Wind Street
Swansea
SA1 1DP
- Phone:
- 07877116486
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window