ROYAL WOOTTON BASSETT ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1135906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charitable activities mainly involve festivals organised in the year such as various music competitions like Guitar competitions, modern pop competitions and others. Other fundraising activities are organized as and when possible.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £22,144
Total expenditure: £15,093

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FESTIVAL (Working name)
  • WOOTTON BASSETT ARTS FESTIVAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Dawn Williams Chair 01 January 2022
None on record
Priya Mane Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Heather Mary Wannell Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
SANDRA MCDOWELL Trustee
None on record
DAXA JANNATY MSc Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.61k £927 £11.55k £15.21k £22.14k
Total expenditure £8.92k £1.18k £6.85k £15.89k £15.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Lansbury Drive
SWINDON
SN2 7LF
Phone:
7740900425