THE NEW MIKVEH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To erect and maintain a ritual/special bath for the use of women of the community at a site in Holders Hill Road, North West London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD DAVID SIMON GLYN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £373 | £373 | £373 | £3.47k | £373 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 336 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 06 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ACCEPTED BY COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE JEWISH ORTHODOX RELIGION BY ERECTING AND MAINTAINING AND ENCOURAGING THE USE OF A MIKVEH ( RITUAL POOL) AT A SITE IN HOLDERS HILL ROAD, LONDON NW4, OR AT ANY OTHER SITE DESIGNATED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE JEWISH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Sherwood Road
Hendon
London
NW4 1AE
- Phone:
- 02075863841
- Email:
- edward_glyn@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window