DUCKLINGTON SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide competitive and enjoyable football and cricket activities which are delivered by responsible and qualified coaches. Football teams participate in the Witney and District League, the Oxford Mail League and the Oxfordshire Invitation League Divisions and the cricket team participate in the Oxford Cricket Association League Divisions. The club now is a home for the game Aunt Sally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 July 2010: Standard registration
- DUCKLINGTON SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB (Working name)
- DUCKLINGTON SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN TOWNSEND JP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edward Todd | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SMYTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.08k | £81.08k | £66.00k | £74.32k | £76.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.92k | £78.92k | £75.00k | £71.42k | £80.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 1 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2007, 14 MAY 2009, AND 10 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DUCKLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DUCKLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Witney Road
Ducklington
WITNEY
OX29 7TS
- Phone:
- 07500284693
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window