Financial history KANZI-KIBERA FRIENDS LTD

Charity number: 1136258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.35k £23.04k £29.41k £66.18k £24.19k
Total expenditure £17.62k £18.51k £25.03k £59.30k £24.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A