SUSTAINABLE AID SUPPORTING HAITI
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
- Haiti
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- SASH (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEEDS AND SUFFERING IN AND THE PORT AU PRINCE AREA AS WELL AS OTHER REGIONS OF HAITI AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF: A) MONEY, FOOD MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND AID OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS AFFECTED. B) BY THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT IN THE REGION AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL DECIDE AND BY ANY MEANS WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
HAITI
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window