OYSTERMOUTH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish of Oystermouth serves the local community of Mumbles through All Saints' Church and Norton Mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 17 June 2010: Standard registration
- 25 February 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1208529 MUMBLES MINISTRY AREA CIO
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.70k | £153.38k | £145.67k | £133.32k | £229.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.44k | £89.72k | £106.65k | £147.92k | £175.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 December 2020 | 52 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window