THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALBAN, WICKERSLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to enable ordinary people to live out their faith as part of our parish community by: Creating a strong centre for worship. Fostering a caring and open fellowship. Maintaining long-term service to the local community and the wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 12 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ST ALBAN'S, WICKERSLEY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JAMES ROSE MA PHD | Chair | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Tanner | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Crabb | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Gascoigne | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Watson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Carver | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Waite | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Rebecca Carver | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Jacques | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cory Jo Lovell | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STELLA GEORGINA ROSE | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNY BROXHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LES TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.19k | £91.50k | £97.46k | £99.18k | £102.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.44k | £97.82k | £86.69k | £86.43k | £119.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 STONE CRESCENT
WICKERSLEY
ROTHERHAM
S66 2HT
- Phone:
- 01709544642
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window