GREEN TREE WORLD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the period under review we were in the process of setting up the charity and in the next period we have secured funding and have commenced charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
- India
Governance
- 12 May 2010: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2011 | 28/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 20 February 2013 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 21 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS AND OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS 2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES 3 THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS GOODS OR SERVICES 4 TO AWARD DONATIONS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENTS AND/OR TO MAKE DONATIONS TOWARDS MEDICAL RESEARCH PROJECTS FOR PERSONS LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD 5 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING DONATIONS OR GRANTS AND/OR GOODS AND/OR SERVICES FOR TREATMENTS AND/OR ALTERNATIVE THERAPIES 6 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY A AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION B PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window