ABACUS CHILDRENS COMMUNITY EDUCATION & SUPPORT (ACCES) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AT THE CORE OF THE CHARITIES WORK HAS BEEN THE RELATIONSHIP WITH BRIGHT BEGINNING'S COMMUNITY NURSERY AND THE SUPPORT TO THE CHILDREN AND FAMILIES ATTENDING THE NURSERY ABOVE AND BEYOND THAT PROVIDED BY A FORMAL NURSERY SETTING.SPONSORED OF TEENAGE MENTORS AT THE CENTRE AT A YOUTH CENTRE. . AROUND 80 CHILDREN A DAY ATTENDED THE YOUTH CENTRE BENEFITING LOCAL CHILDREN RANGING FROM 3-11YRS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockport
Governance
- 14 September 2010: Standard registration
- 01 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ACCES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/05/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.61k | £46.61k | £15.00k | £15.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.88k | £29.29k | £26.61k | £21.60k | £12.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 22 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 23 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 JULY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS AND THEIR WIDER FAMILIES IN THE ADSWOOD AREA OF STOCKPORT (AND SURROUNDING AREAS) BY: A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF COURSES AND TRAINING IN SUBJECTS SUCH AS NUTRITION, PARENTING AND LIFE SKILLS; AND B. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
STOCKPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window