Cambridge United Foundation Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cambridge United Foundation is the charitable arm of Cambridge United Football Club. We use the power of sport and the brand of Cambridge United FC to empower our community and change lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£929,849
Donations and legacies | £741.41k | |
Charitable activities | £188.44k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£598,372
Raising funds | £39.25k | |
Charitable activities | £559.12k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £30,229 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £39.25k | |
Charitable expenditure | £559.12k | |
Retained for future use | £331.48k |
People

22 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 August 2010: Standard registration
- Cambridge United Community Trust Ltd (Previous name)
- CAMBRIDGE UNITED YOUTH AND COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- UNITED IN ENDEAVOUR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel John Driver | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Alice Liljana Kempski | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GODRIC SMITH | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WINN | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathon Bell | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Goodall | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Schofield | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Munday | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JIM HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.66k | £287.12k | £512.35k | £488.27k | £929.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.82k | £286.88k | £484.24k | £570.42k | £598.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.78k | £23.83k | £16.71k | £12.50k | £30.23k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £89.69k | N/A | £741.41k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £262.84k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £159.81k | N/A | £188.44k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £433.58k | N/A | £559.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £50.67k | N/A | £39.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £575 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.93k | N/A | £8.86k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £160.74k | N/A | £415.75k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £32.11k | N/A | £24.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 JUNE 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 24 JUNE 2010 as amended on 07 Jul 2022 as amended on 01 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES LIVING IN THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA, AND ADJOINING COUNTIES, BY: 1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND LEISURE PROGRAMMES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL WELFARE, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE(Y, FOOTBALL" 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, COURSES AND FACILITIES. 3) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY DEVELOPING AND PROVIDING HEALTHY LIVING ACTIVITIES AND PROGRAMMES WHICH EDUCATE PARTICIPANTS IN THE BENEFITS OF HEALTHY LIFESTYLES, HEALTHY EATING AND EXERCISE. 4) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (C) DEVELOPING PROGRAMMES AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE EMPLOYMENT PROSPECTS.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cambridge United Foundation Limited
Abbey Stadium
Newmarket Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8LN
- Phone:
- 01223632129
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window