Trustees ACTION 21 (2010)

Charity number: 1136450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ashique Panakkat Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Dr Jessica Clare Robins Trustee 12 January 2025
None on record
Ollie James Roberts Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Rameshchandra Patel Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Nicola Marie Baker Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
EMMA KNIGHTS Trustee 09 April 2024
None on record
John O Maoileoin Trustee 09 April 2024
None on record