Financial history THE WEST END COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1138467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.19k £52.03k £34.75k £33.62k £31.26k
Total expenditure £29.40k £32.63k £36.78k £38.47k £35.03k
Income from government contracts £3.00k £4.02k £4.00k £4.07k £4.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A