Accounts and annual returns CHESTER GROSVENOR 76 ROUND TABLE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1136003
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 February 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2022 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window